U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-61222-
  • Case Name: CAMPBELL & SON, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • April 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion - BK]
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • January 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • January 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Corp./Part.)]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules]
  • December 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • December 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • December 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • December 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • December 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • December 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corp./Part.)]
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.