U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-61235-
  • Case Name: MICHAEL ORVILLE HEARN and MITZI RACINE HEARN
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Discharging Debtor(s) After Completion of Plan in a Chapter 13 Case]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order on Motion for Entry of Discharge]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion for Entry of Discharge and Attorney Certification]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • August 02, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Modification of Plan]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Modify Plan-all chapters (modified after confirmation)]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • June 22, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • June 22, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • June 15, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • June 13, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Compensation (Ch. 13)]
May, 2022
  • May 28, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • May 16, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Dismiss Case -Trustee]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Ch. 13 - Attorney for Debtor(s) Only)]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 21, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Modification of Plan]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Modify Plan-all chapters (modified after confirmation)]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Compel]
  • January 26, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Vacate]
  • January 24, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Vacating Hearing/Resetting]
  • January 24, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Compel]
  • January 18, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • January 06, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Dismiss Case -Trustee]
  • January 06, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Compel - BK]
November, 2021
  • November 26, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • November 24, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Modification of Plan]
October, 2021
  • October 30, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • October 28, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Continue Hearing]
  • October 27, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • October 26, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Modify Plan-all chapters (modified after confirmation)]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • September 13, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Dismiss Case -Trustee]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Dismiss Case -Trustee]
  • June 19, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Compel]
  • June 17, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Compel]
  • June 02, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Compel - BK]
March, 2021
  • March 05, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 03, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Modification of Plan]
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Modify Plan-all chapters (modified after confirmation)]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • February 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • February 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • February 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Continue Hearing]
  • February 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • February 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Sustaining Objection to Claim]
January, 2020
  • January 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • January 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Continue Hearing]
  • January 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • December 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • December 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • December 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.