U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-61248-
  • Case Name: AARON L. PERRY
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Case Closure (Chapter7)]
October, 2024
  • October 18, 2024: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
August, 2021
  • August 04, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • August 02, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Compensation]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
September, 2020
  • September 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Sustaining Objection to Claim]
  • September 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Order on Objection to Claim]
April, 2020
  • April 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object to Discharge]
  • April 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Motion to Extend Time to Object to Discharge]
February, 2020
  • February 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Abandon]
  • February 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Order on Notice of Trustee's Intent to Abandon]
  • February 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order for Relief from Stay]
  • February 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • February 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
  • February 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order for Relief from Stay]
  • February 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • February 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
January, 2020
  • January 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • January 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Employ]
  • January 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • January 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • January 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • January 14, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Employ]
  • January 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • January 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • January 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
December, 2019
  • December 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • December 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.