U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-61254-
  • Case Name: DANIEL FREDRICK ENGELLANT and DANIELLE MARIE ENGELLANT
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
September, 2022
  • September 10, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • September 08, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order on Motion for Entry of Discharge]
  • September 04, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • September 02, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Discharging Debtor(s) After Completion of Plan in a Chapter 12 Case]
  • September 02, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
August, 2022
  • August 27, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • August 25, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • August 02, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion for Entry of Discharge and Attorney Certification]
June, 2022
  • June 25, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • June 24, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • June 23, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Compensation (Ch. 11 or 12)]
  • June 22, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Compensation]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
  • May 27, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Ch11 or 12 - Attorney for Debtor(s) Only)]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • January 18, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Compensation]
  • January 14, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion for Approval]
  • January 12, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion for Approval]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
  • December 22, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion for Approval - BK]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • November 10, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Compensation]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
August, 2021
  • August 11, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • August 09, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Employ]
  • August 06, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion to Employ]
April, 2020
  • April 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Extend Time]
  • April 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • April 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
  • April 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Redact (Fee Per Case)]
  • April 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Redact - Claims (Fee Per Case)]
  • April 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • April 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
  • April 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order for Relief from Stay]
  • March 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • March 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Chapter 12 Plan Pre-Confirmation Hearing]
  • March 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • February 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
  • February 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • February 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Participate in ASCS Program]
  • February 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion to Participate in ASCS Program]
  • February 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Employ]
  • January 31, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • January 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules]
  • January 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • January 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • January 14, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • January 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Employ]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • January 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules]
  • January 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • January 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
December, 2019
  • December 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12 (Individual/Joint)]
  • December 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.