U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-bk-20008-
  • Case Name: SHERMAN HENRY VELTKAMP
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 13, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
December, 2020
  • December 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Compromise Under Rule 9019]
  • December 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019]
  • December 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
November, 2020
  • November 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • November 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • November 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • November 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • October 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • October 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • October 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • October 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Approving Stipulation]
  • October 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Approving Stipulation]
  • September 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion for Approval - BK]
February, 2020
  • February 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • February 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
January, 2020
  • January 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice]
  • January 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Generic Notice - BK]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.