U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-bk-40005-
  • Case Name: PETER MATTHEW DALE and MAIVE RITA DALE
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Generic Motion - BK]
December, 2022
  • December 17, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • December 15, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Compensation]
  • December 14, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Assignmen/Transfer of Claim]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • January 11, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Errata - BK]
  • January 10, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Compensation]
  • January 07, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • January 05, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • January 03, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Compensation]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
  • December 04, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Vacate]
  • December 02, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Vacating Hearing/Resetting]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion for Turnover of Property]
  • November 01, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Turnover of Property]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Minutes of Hearing Held Non-evidentiary]
  • October 29, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • October 28, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • October 26, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • October 23, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • October 21, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Compensation (Ch. 11 or 12)]
  • October 20, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • October 18, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Employ]
  • October 15, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • October 08, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
  • October 07, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Motion for Turnover of Property]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • September 24, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion for Compensation (Ch11 or 12 - Attorney for Debtor(s) Only)]
  • September 22, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Compensation (Ch. 11 or 12)]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • August 17, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Confirm Plan]
  • July 26, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
  • July 26, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan]
  • July 23, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • July 19, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Ballot Report]
June, 2021
  • June 27, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • June 25, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order Conditionally Approving Disclosure Statement and Setting Ch. 11 Plan Confirmation Hearing]
  • June 25, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic)]
  • June 25, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • June 16, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • June 16, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • June 14, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Extend Time to File Objections to Claims of Exemption Under Fed. R. Bankr. P. 4003(b)]
  • June 14, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Approving Stipulation]
  • June 10, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Extend Time to File Objections to Claims of Exemption Under Fed. R. Bankr. P. 4003(b)]
  • June 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • June 03, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Extend Time to File Objections to Claims of Exemption Under Fed. R. Bankr. P. 4003(b)]
  • June 02, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Extend Time to File Objections to Claims of Exemption Under Fed. R. Bankr. P. 4003(b)]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • May 12, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • May 10, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • May 10, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Approving Stipulation]
  • May 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Disclosure Statement]
  • May 03, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • May 03, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Approving Disclosure Statement]
April, 2021
  • April 18, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • April 17, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • April 16, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
  • April 15, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • April 13, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
  • April 10, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 08, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 07, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 07, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Reconsider]
  • April 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Vacating Hearing/Resetting]
  • April 02, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • April 01, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • March 10, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • March 10, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 08, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 08, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Reconsider]
  • March 07, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Reconsider - BK]
  • March 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • March 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Correspondence]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Reconsider - BK]
  • February 25, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion for Compensation (Ch11 or 12 - Attorney for Debtor(s) Only)]
  • February 24, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Memorandum of Decision]
  • February 24, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • February 24, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Sustaining Objection to Claim]
  • February 22, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • February 22, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order on Objection to Claim]
  • February 22, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Memorandum of Decision - BK]
  • February 14, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Memorandum of Decision]
  • February 14, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Sustaining Objection to Claim]
  • February 12, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order on Objection to Claim]
  • February 12, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Memorandum of Decision - BK]
  • February 10, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Record of Exhibits]
  • February 09, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Record of Exhibits]
  • January 23, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • January 22, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • January 22, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • January 21, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • January 21, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • January 21, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Redact]
  • January 21, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Judicial Notice]
  • January 20, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Redact (Fee Per Case)]
  • January 20, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Motion/Request for Judicial Notice]
  • January 20, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Judicial Notice]
  • January 19, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Motion/Request for Judicial Notice]
  • January 19, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Judicial Notice]
  • January 18, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Motion/Request for Judicial Notice]
  • January 17, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 17, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 16, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • January 15, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 15, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Appear pro hac vice]
  • January 14, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 14, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic)]
  • January 13, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 13, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • January 01, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 30, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • December 24, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • December 22, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • December 22, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
  • December 20, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • December 18, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 18, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion]
  • December 17, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion - BK]
  • December 16, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 11, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 09, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 05, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • December 03, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic)]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • November 17, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic)]
  • November 14, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Sustaining Objection to Claim]
  • November 12, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order on Objection to Claim]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • October 14, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • October 13, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • October 07, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • October 05, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic)]
  • October 02, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
September, 2020
  • September 26, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • September 24, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
April, 2020
  • April 10, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 08, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 07, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion to Employ]
February, 2020
  • February 05, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • February 03, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • January 26, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules]
  • January 24, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • January 24, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • January 19, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice]
  • January 17, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Generic Notice - BK]
  • January 16, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • January 16, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.