U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:20-ap-09001-
  • Case Name: PLAINTIFF v. BORKHOLDER
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Judgment]
  • June 30, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • June 28, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • June 28, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • June 28, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Approving Stipulation]
  • June 23, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • June 21, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • June 17, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
May, 2021
  • May 29, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • May 27, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Continue Hearing]
  • May 26, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Continue Hearing - ADV]
  • May 01, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 28, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Minutes of Hearing Held - ADV]
  • April 04, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • April 02, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Continue Hearing]
  • April 01, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 01, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 05, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 03, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 03, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Minutes of Hearing Held - ADV]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • February 16, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
April, 2020
  • April 04, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • April 02, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
February, 2020
  • February 23, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • February 21, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • February 06, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • February 04, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • February 03, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Generic Notice - ADV]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.