U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-ap-01001-
  • Case Name: BUCHHOLZ et al v. RUEGSEGGER et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Dismiss Proceedings]
  • October 14, 2020: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • October 14, 2020: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Order Dismissing Proceedings]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
April, 2020
  • April 10, 2020: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Objection to Motion]
  • April 08, 2020: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • April 06, 2020: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • April 03, 2020: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Motion to Extend Time - ADV]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Motion to Dismiss Case]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • February 06, 2020: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Proof of Service]
  • February 04, 2020: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Notice to File Proof of Service or Case Will Be Referred to the Court for Dismissal]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Generic Notice - ADV]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.