U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-bk-40003-
  • Case Name: TRAVIS NEIL STONE
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • September 16, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
  • September 15, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
April, 2020
  • April 07, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Motion for Turnover of Property]
  • April 02, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
  • March 18, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Stmnt Cmpltn Prsnl Fncl Mgmnt]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
January, 2020
  • January 19, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice]
  • January 17, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Generic Notice - BK]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.