U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-bk-20017-
  • Case Name: GEORGE ALLEN HURST and LINDA SUE HURST
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Hearing Terminated - Text Only]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion for Entry of Discharge and Attorney Certification]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Clerk's Notice for Motion for Discharge]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Clerk's Notice for Motion for Discharge]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Dismiss Case -Trustee]
February, 2020
  • February 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • February 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • February 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • February 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
January, 2020
  • January 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice]
  • January 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Notice - BK]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.