U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:20-bk-90004-
  • Case Name: DUANE R. MOLITOR and TEENA S. MOLITOR
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Transcript]
April, 2020
  • April 05, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • April 03, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Continue Hearing]
  • April 03, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • February 24, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Redact (Fee Per Case)]
  • February 24, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Redact - Claims (Fee Per Case)]
  • February 20, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules]
  • January 29, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • January 29, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • January 19, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice]
  • January 17, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Notice - BK]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.