U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-bk-40006-
  • Case Name: DEBRA MARGARET KIRBY
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Discharging Debtor(s) After Completion of Plan in a Chapter 13 Case]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order on Motion for Entry of Discharge]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion for Entry of Discharge and Attorney Certification]
January, 2023
  • January 08, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Modification of Plan]
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Modify Plan]
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Modify Plan-all chapters (modified after confirmation)]
December, 2022
  • December 17, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • December 15, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Compensation (Ch. 13)]
  • December 09, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • December 09, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 07, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 07, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Compensation (Ch. 13)]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • October 08, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • October 06, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • October 01, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Continue Hearing]
  • September 27, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • September 09, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Ch. 13 - Attorney for Debtor(s) Only)]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • August 12, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Dismiss Case -Trustee]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Assignment/Transfer of Claim]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • December 06, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Modification of Plan]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Modify Plan-all chapters (modified after confirmation)]
  • November 12, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Modify Plan-all chapters (modified after confirmation)]
  • November 11, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • November 09, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
December, 2020
  • December 02, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Objection/Response to Motion to Modify Stay (Hearing Required)]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Objection/Response to Motion to Modify Stay (Hearing Required)]
  • November 18, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Vacate]
April, 2020
  • April 09, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • April 07, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Extend Time]
  • April 06, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
March, 2020
  • March 28, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • March 26, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Continue Hearing]
  • March 26, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • March 26, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Trustee's Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 7]
  • March 25, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 23, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order (Generic)]
  • March 23, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Correspondence]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules]
  • January 29, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Add Judge]
  • January 28, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • January 27, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • January 23, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • January 21, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • January 19, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice]
  • January 17, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Notice - BK]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.