U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-bk-40002-
  • Case Name: SCHMAUS FAMILY PROPERTIES, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • January 10, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Compensation (Ch. 11 or 12)]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion for Compensation (Ch11 or 12 - Attorney for Debtor(s) Only)]
October, 2020
  • October 11, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • October 09, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • October 09, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Compensation]
  • October 07, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
  • September 22, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
  • September 19, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Confirm Plan]
  • September 18, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • September 17, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan]
  • September 16, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Approving Stipulation]
  • September 06, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • September 05, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • September 04, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • September 04, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order Setting Hearing]
  • September 04, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • September 03, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Ballot Report]
  • September 03, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Compensation]
  • September 02, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Generic Motion]
  • September 01, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Generic Motion - BK]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Objection/Response to Motion to Modify Stay (Hearing Required)]
  • March 09, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • March 02, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
February, 2020
  • February 23, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • February 21, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • February 06, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion to Employ]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • January 29, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • January 23, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules]
  • January 21, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • January 21, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • January 17, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.