U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-bk-40008-
  • Case Name: JAMES ROY WEATHERFORD and ROSEANNA FASSO-WEATHERFORD
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • October 14, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
  • October 14, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
April, 2020
  • April 08, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Overdue Installment Fee]
  • April 08, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • April 06, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
March, 2020
  • March 04, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Third)]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Generic Notice - BK]
  • February 07, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Second)]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • January 23, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • January 21, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Order on Application/Motion to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • January 21, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • January 21, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Application/Motion to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.