U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-bk-10007-
  • Case Name: THOMAS GUESSEPPE ROBINSON and MICHELLE KATHLEEN BRAZEE
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • January 09, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Modification of Plan]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Modify Plan-all chapters (modified after confirmation)]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • March 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Compensation (Ch. 13)]
  • March 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Ch. 13 - Attorney for Debtor(s) Only)]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic - BK]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Sale of Property]
  • January 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • January 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Sale of Property under Section 363(b)]
  • January 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Continue Hearing]
  • January 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • January 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b)]
  • January 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Response to Motion]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b)]
  • December 23, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • December 21, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Continue Hearing]
  • December 21, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • December 10, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • December 08, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Employ]
  • December 07, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion to Employ]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • November 16, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Dismiss Case -Trustee]
June, 2021
  • June 18, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Dismiss Case -Trustee]
September, 2020
  • September 04, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Sustaining Objection to Claim]
  • September 02, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order on Objection to Claim]
March, 2020
  • March 21, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • March 19, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Continue Hearing]
  • March 19, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • February 24, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • February 21, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion Compelling Turnover of Documents to the U.S. Trustee/Trustee]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • January 27, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • January 27, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.