U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:20-ap-09002-
  • Case Name: SPROUT v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • October 09, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Judgment]
  • October 03, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • October 01, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • October 01, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
September, 2020
  • September 04, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Motion for Summary Judgment - ADV]
April, 2020
  • April 04, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Trial]
  • April 01, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Order Setting Trial]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 23, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • March 21, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 20, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Motion for Judgment]
  • March 19, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 05, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Proof of Service]
  • March 05, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • March 03, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 03, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • March 03, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Motion to Extend Time - ADV]
  • March 03, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Notice to File Appropriate Pleading or Case Will Be Referred to the Court for Dismissal]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.