U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-bk-10010-
  • Case Name: TIMOTHY CARPENTER and LADONNA CARPENTER
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 18, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Generic Motion]
  • March 17, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Generic Motion - BK]
February, 2020
  • February 05, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Second)]
  • February 01, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 01, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • January 30, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Receipt of Installment Payment (First)]
  • January 29, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • January 29, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • January 29, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Generic Notice - BK]
  • January 28, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order on Application/Motion to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • January 28, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.