U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-bk-40012-
  • Case Name: JANET LYN NEIL
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • August 10, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Trustee's Notice of Proposed Distribution]
  • July 15, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
March, 2020
  • March 11, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • March 09, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
February, 2020
  • February 02, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • January 31, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.