U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-bk-10015-
  • Case Name: MICHELLE D. LUCE
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Case Closure (Chapter 7)]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • July 06, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Compensation]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Pay]
  • June 11, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
  • June 09, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Pay]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Pay]
  • May 25, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Pay ]
  • May 24, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Pay]
  • May 21, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Pay ]
February, 2021
  • February 05, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • February 03, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Employ]
  • February 03, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion to Employ]
October, 2020
  • October 04, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Sale of Property]
  • October 02, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Approving Sale of Property]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 18, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Generic Motion]
  • March 17, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Generic Motion - BK]
  • March 08, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • March 05, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Approving Stipulation]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules]
  • February 07, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • February 07, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • February 06, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
  • February 05, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • February 04, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic - BK]
  • February 04, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.