U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:20-ap-09004-
  • Case Name: PARK WESTERN LEASING, INC. v. GOODSELL
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • May 21, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 05, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Judgment]
  • May 05, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Memorandum of Decision]
  • May 03, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • May 03, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Memorandum of Decision - AD]
January, 2021
  • January 30, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • January 29, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Minutes of Trial Held]
  • January 28, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • January 16, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Approving]
  • January 14, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Order Approving]
  • January 14, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Minutes of Hearing Held]
December, 2020
  • December 11, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 09, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Order Setting Trial]
  • December 09, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 09, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Minutes of Hearing Held - ADV]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • October 19, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • October 19, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • October 11, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • October 09, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • October 09, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • October 07, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • October 06, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
April, 2020
  • April 04, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Trial]
  • April 02, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Order Setting Trial]
March, 2020
  • March 08, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 05, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 05, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2020
  • February 07, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.