U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-bk-10018-
  • Case Name: KOCH CATTLE, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Amend]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Amend]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Amend - BK]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Compensation (Ch. 11 or 12)]
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion For Joint Administration]
  • March 11, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Joint Administration]
  • March 04, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • March 02, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Employ]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion for Joint Administration]
  • February 23, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules]
  • February 21, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • February 20, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • February 07, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • February 07, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.