U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-bk-10017
  • Case Name: JEFFREY A. KOCH and SHERE L. KOCH
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order (Generic)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Compensation (Ch. 11 or 12)]
October, 2022
  • October 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Vacate]
  • October 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Vacating Hearing/Resetting]
  • October 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • October 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Approving Modification of Plan]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • September 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Modify Plan-all chapters (modified after confirmation)]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Dismiss Case -Trustee]
July, 2021
  • July 09, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • July 07, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Compensation]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
January, 2021
  • January 01, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Approving Modification of Plan]
  • December 08, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Modify Plan-all chapters (modified after confirmation)]
April, 2020
  • April 05, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • April 03, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Approving Stipulation]
  • April 02, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • April 01, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 31, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Generic Motion]
  • March 31, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Generic Motion - BK]
  • March 30, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order (Generic)]
  • March 23, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • March 15, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • March 13, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion For Joint Administration]
  • March 13, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Employ]
  • March 12, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • March 12, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • March 12, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • March 11, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Shorten Time]
  • March 11, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Joint Administration]
  • March 10, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Approving Stipulation]
  • March 10, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Continue Hearing]
  • March 10, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Entered in Error - BK]
  • March 09, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • March 09, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 09, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Shorten Time]
  • March 06, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Shorten Time]
  • March 06, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Expedite Hearing - BK]
  • March 06, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion for Conditional Use of Cash Collateral]
  • March 04, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • March 02, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Employ]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion for Joint Administration]
  • February 07, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 [Application/Motion to Employ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.