U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-bk-20042-
  • Case Name: RYAN PAUL ZITZOW
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • November 17, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
August, 2021
  • August 29, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 26, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • August 26, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Terminate original trustee and appoint new trustee]
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • October 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • October 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order for Relief from Stay]
  • October 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Dismiss Case -Trustee]
  • September 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • February 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • February 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • February 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.