U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-bk-40019-
  • Case Name: MICHELLE LEA VYE
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 25, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • November 23, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • November 23, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
  • November 11, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Stmnt Cmpltn Prsnl Fncl Mgmnt]
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • August 30, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Terminate original trustee and appoint new trustee]
January, 2021
  • January 13, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • January 11, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Modification of Plan]
December, 2020
  • December 18, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Modify Plan-all chapters (modified after confirmation)]
April, 2020
  • April 10, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • April 08, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 23, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order (Generic)]
  • March 23, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Motion - BK]
  • March 05, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules]
  • March 03, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • March 03, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • March 01, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
February, 2020
  • February 29, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 28, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • February 27, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • February 21, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 21, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • February 19, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • February 19, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • February 19, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.