U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:20-bk-90016-
  • Case Name: CARL EUGENE HORTON
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 02, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
June, 2021
  • June 13, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • June 13, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • June 11, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Discharging Debtor(s) After Completion of Plan in a Chapter 13 Case]
  • June 11, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order on Motion for Entry of Discharge]
  • June 10, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion for Entry of Discharge and Attorney Certification]
  • June 04, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - Deficiency Notice for Motion for Discharge]
  • June 02, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Deficiency Notice for Motion for Discharge]
May, 2021
  • May 08, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • May 06, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Disallow Claims]
  • May 06, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
March, 2021
  • March 10, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Disallow Claims]
March, 2020
  • March 29, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 27, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 21, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 19, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order (Generic)]
  • March 18, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Motion - BK]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • February 25, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.