U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-bk-40017-
  • Case Name: HARVEY OST OILFIELD SERVICES, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • September 13, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 11, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Case]
April, 2020
  • April 02, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion for Interim Fees]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 17, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion]
  • March 08, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • March 06, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • February 28, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion]
  • February 27, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion - BK]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.