U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-bk-10025-
  • Case Name: SHAWN M. DOUGLAS and STEPHANIE DOUGLAS
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Clerk's Notice for Motion for Discharge]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Clerk's Notice for Motion for Discharge]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Compel - BK]
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Dismiss Case -Trustee]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Vacate]
September, 2020
  • September 17, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Avoid Lien]
  • September 15, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Avoid Judicial Lien]
  • September 04, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • September 03, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • September 02, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Compensation (Ch. 13)]
  • September 01, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Avoid Judicial Lien]
  • August 29, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • August 27, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
April, 2020
  • April 02, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order (Generic)]
  • March 30, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Motion - BK]
  • March 05, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 05, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • March 03, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • March 03, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 03, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.