U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-bk-40018-
  • Case Name: DESTINY DAWN MARTENS
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 23, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Order (Generic)]
  • March 23, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Generic Motion - BK]
  • March 05, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 04, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 03, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • March 03, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Terminate original trustee and appoint new trustee]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.