U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-bk-40022-
  • Case Name: GREGORY ROBERT GONSER
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 10, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Motion to Dismiss Case -Trustee]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 23, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Generic Motion]
  • March 23, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Generic Motion - BK]
  • March 08, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 05, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • March 05, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.