U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-bk-20067-
  • Case Name: NICOLE JOANNA HALL
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
April, 2021
  • April 01, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic - BK]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • March 29, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
  • March 18, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Assignmen/Transfer of Claim]
  • March 07, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Trustee's Notice of Proposed Distribution]
  • March 06, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 04, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
  • March 04, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Vacating Chapter 7 Fee Waiver Under USC 28:1930(f)]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • October 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
  • October 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Reopen]
  • October 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Reopen Chapter 7 Case to Administer Assets]
  • October 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Trustee's Motion to Reopen Chapter 7 Case to Administer Assets]
April, 2020
  • April 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Generic Motion]
  • March 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Generic Motion - BK]
  • March 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application of Chapter 7 fee waiver under USC 28:1930(f)]
  • March 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • March 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Chapter 7 Fee Waiver Under USC 28:1930(f)]
  • March 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Application/Motion for Chapter 7 Fee Waiver Under USC 28:1930(f)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.