U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:20-bk-90044-
  • Case Name: TRAVIS J. SCHWEIGERT
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 10, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Discharging Debtor(s) After Completion of Plan in a Chapter 13 Case]
  • December 04, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order on Motion for Entry of Discharge]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion for Entry of Discharge and Attorney Certification]
  • November 04, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Deficiency Notice for Motion for Discharge]
  • November 02, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Deficiency Notice for Motion for Discharge]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • October 17, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Compensation]
  • October 07, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Sell]
  • October 05, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Sell]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
  • September 15, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Response to Motion]
  • September 07, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(f)]
March, 2022
  • March 20, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • March 18, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Employ]
  • March 17, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion to Employ]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Notice - BK]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • November 17, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Certificate of Record on Appeal]
  • November 17, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Designation of Record (Other)]
  • November 09, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Transcript]
  • November 04, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Transcript Ordered Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • November 03, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Transcript Ordered Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • November 03, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Designation of Record (Other)]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Transmittal Memorandum (USDC)]
  • October 21, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Election of Appeal to District Court]
  • October 21, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Notice of Appeal]
  • October 10, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • October 09, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Memorandum of Decision]
  • October 09, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Sustaining Objection to Claim]
  • October 08, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • October 08, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • October 07, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order on Objection to Claim]
  • October 07, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Memorandum of Decision - BK]
September, 2020
  • September 13, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • September 11, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • September 11, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order (Generic)]
  • September 10, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
April, 2020
  • April 13, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • April 11, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • April 10, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules]
  • April 10, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • April 09, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Motion]
  • April 08, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Motion - BK]
  • April 08, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • April 07, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
March, 2020
  • March 28, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules]
  • March 26, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • March 25, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • March 13, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 13, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • March 11, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 11, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • March 11, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.