U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-bk-10032-
  • Case Name: BRIAN DAVID MASSA and BRITTANY AUTUMN MASSA
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 08, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 06, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Motion - BK]
  • March 30, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Motion - BK]
  • March 28, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 26, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Terminate original trustee and appoint new trustee]
  • March 26, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order (Generic)]
  • March 26, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Motion - BK]
  • March 26, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Generic Motion - BK]
  • March 13, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 13, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • March 11, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • March 11, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Add Judge]
  • March 11, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.