U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:20-bk-90047-
  • Case Name: ELIZABETH KAY HELMERS and DAIN MARSHALL DARYL HELMERS
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 09, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Receipt of Installment Payment (Second)]
March, 2020
  • March 28, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 26, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Generic Motion]
  • March 25, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Generic Motion - BK]
  • March 14, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 14, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • March 13, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Receipt of Installment Payment (First)]
  • March 12, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • March 12, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order on Application/Motion to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • March 12, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.