U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-bk-10035-
  • Case Name: KENT MICHAEL BENNETT and JULIE ANN BENNETT
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 27, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 23, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • October 21, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • October 06, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Dismiss Case -Trustee]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Vacate]
  • September 13, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Vacate]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
  • August 26, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Vacate]
  • August 25, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • August 10, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Dismiss Case -Trustee]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Assignmen/Transfer of Claim]
December, 2020
  • December 27, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Objection/Response to Motion to Modify Stay (Hearing Required)]
  • December 14, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
November, 2020
  • November 06, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Assignmen/Transfer of Claim]
April, 2020
  • April 02, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Motion]
  • March 30, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Motion - BK]
  • March 18, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 16, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 16, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.