U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-bk-20082-
  • Case Name: MICHEAL DAVID SOTO and KALONI RAE WILLIAMS-SCOW
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
April, 2020
  • April 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • April 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Generic Motion]
  • April 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Generic Motion - BK]
  • April 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Second)]
  • April 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Generic Motion]
  • March 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Generic Motion - BK]
  • March 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • March 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • March 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Generic Notice - BK]
  • March 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order on Application/Motion to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • March 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Application/Motion to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.