U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-bk-40028-
  • Case Name: MATTHEW JAMES POWERS
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 10, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 08, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • April 04, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules]
  • April 02, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • April 01, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
March, 2020
  • March 21, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 21, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • March 19, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • March 19, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • March 19, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Change Venue]
  • March 19, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Add Judge]
  • March 18, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Motion to Change Venue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.