U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-bk-40030-
  • Case Name: HARLIN DANIEL STINES and ALANNA MARIE STINES
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 25, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • June 23, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Modification of Plan]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Modify Plan-all chapters (modified after confirmation)]
  • May 18, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Modify Plan-all chapters (modified after confirmation)]
January, 2022
  • January 16, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • January 14, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Modification of Plan]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Modify Plan-all chapters (modified after confirmation)]
  • December 22, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • December 20, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Modification of Plan]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Modify Plan-all chapters (modified after confirmation)]
August, 2021
  • August 29, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • August 27, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Modification of Plan]
  • August 04, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Modify Plan-all chapters (modified after confirmation)]
March, 2021
  • March 06, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 04, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Modification of Plan]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Modify Plan-all chapters (modified after confirmation)]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 25, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • March 20, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • March 20, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 20, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.