U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:20-bk-90060-
  • Case Name: TODD STEPHEN CARY
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Discharging Debtor(s) After Completion of Plan in a Chapter 13 Case]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order on Motion for Entry of Discharge]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion for Entry of Discharge and Attorney Certification]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Clerk's Notice for Motion for Discharge]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Clerk's Notice for Motion for Discharge]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • June 28, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • June 17, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • June 03, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Dismiss Case -Trustee]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Dismiss Case -Trustee]
April, 2020
  • April 11, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • April 09, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Motion]
  • April 08, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Motion - BK]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 24, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 24, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.