open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Montana

MONTANA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Montana
    Case Number:2:20-bk-20094-
    Party Name:MICHAEL PATRICK RICHARDS and MONICA LEA RICHARDS
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Generic Motion]
    Date Published:March 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Generic Motion - BK]
    Date Published:March 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:March 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Add Judge]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.mtb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?83815
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =