U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-bk-10057-
  • Case Name: JUSTO L. GONZALEZ-TRAPAGA
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • March 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Employ]
  • March 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion to Employ]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order for Relief from Stay]
  • August 18, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • August 03, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order for Relief from Stay]
  • April 20, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • April 05, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Abandon]
  • January 26, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order on Notice of Trustee's Intent to Abandon]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Close Adversary Case]
  • December 02, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • December 02, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
  • November 30, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order on Motion for Entry of Discharge]
  • November 25, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion for Entry of Discharge and Attorney Certification]
  • November 01, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Approving]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Avoid Lien]
  • October 30, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019]
  • October 30, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Approving]
  • October 08, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Avoid Lien]
  • October 08, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • September 28, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • September 11, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019]
April, 2020
  • April 09, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 07, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • April 01, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.