U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-bk-20101-
  • Case Name: WALLACE C PEEL JR
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 12, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Reopen]
  • June 10, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Reopen Case]
  • June 10, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Avoid Lien]
  • June 10, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Reopen Case - BK]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
February, 2021
  • February 03, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • February 01, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
January, 2021
  • January 10, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Trustee's Notice of Proposed Distribution]
  • January 08, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
  • January 01, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Approving]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Approving]
  • December 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • December 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Approving Stipulation]
April, 2020
  • April 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • April 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.