U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-po-05029-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Shelley
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Disposition of Count (Updates CVB)]
August, 2020
  • August 20, 2020: [Payment Received (Updates CVB) - SDM]
  • August 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate ]
  • August 19, 2020: [Vacate]
  • August 07, 2020: [Order to Continue - SDM]
  • August 07, 2020: [Terminate Hearings - SDM]
  • August 06, 2020: [Minute Entry - MT]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
  • July 22, 2020: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.