U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:20-po-05001-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Atchley
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Payment Rescheduled (Updates CVB) - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Disposition of Count (Updates CVB)]
  • January 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate ]
  • January 31, 2022: [Vacate]
  • January 31, 2022: [Plea Letter]
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • July 27, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order Setting - MTD]
  • June 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
August, 2020
  • August 05, 2020: [Terminate Hearings - SDM]
  • August 05, 2020: [Add Disposition Text]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.