U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:20-po-05010-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Pratt
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Disposition of Count (Updates CVB)]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Disposition of Count (Updates CVB)]
  • May 27, 2021: [Disposition NEF (Updates CVB) - MT]
  • May 25, 2021: [Disposition of Count (Updates CVB)]
  • May 10, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • May 10, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
August, 2020
  • August 05, 2020: [Add Disposition Text]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.