open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

MONTANA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana
    Case Number:1:20-cr-00085-1
    Party Name:USA v. Nixon
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order - SDM]
    Date Published:September 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
    Date Published:September 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting - MT]
    Date Published:September 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
    Date Published:September 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
    Date Published:September 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
    Date Published:September 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance SDM]
    Date Published:September 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment - SDM]
    Date Published:September 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
    Date Published:September 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:August 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter - MT]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment (Sealed)]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.mtd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?64472
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =