open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

MONTANA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana
    Case Number:4:20-cr-00055-1
    Party Name:USA v. Mattson
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
    Date Published:September 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order - SDM]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
    Date Published:September 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
    Date Published:September 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
    Date Published:September 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
    Date Published:September 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment - SDM]
    Date Published:September 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance SDM]
    Date Published:September 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
    Date Published:September 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest ]
    Date Published:September 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Warrant ]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant ]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment (Sealed)]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.mtd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?64470
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =