open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

MONTANA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana
    Case Number:1:20-cr-00086-1
    Party Name:USA v. Rock
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
    Date Published:September 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
    Date Published:September 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:September 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue ]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
    Date Published:August 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
    Date Published:August 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed ]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order - SDM]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance SDM]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment - SDM]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest ]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment (Sealed)]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.mtd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?64466
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =