open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

MONTANA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana
    Case Number:2:20-cr-00020-1
    Party Name:USA v. Schoenwald
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
    Date Published:September 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention - SDM]
    Date Published:September 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
    Date Published:September 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
    Date Published:September 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting - MT]
    Date Published:September 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance SDM]
    Date Published:September 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment - SDM]
    Date Published:September 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed ]
    Date Published:September 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment (Sealed)]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.mtd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?64460
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =