U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:20-po-05010-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Owens
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Mail Returned - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Forfeiture of Collateral]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
  • February 16, 2022: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Payment Rescheduled (Updates CVB) - MT]
  • December 14, 2021: [Disposition of Count (Updates CVB)]
  • December 13, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • December 08, 2021: [Disposition of Count (Updates CVB)]
  • December 08, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Mail Returned - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Order Setting - MTD]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Disposition NEF (Updates CVB) - MT]
  • January 13, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
August, 2020
  • August 11, 2020: [Terminate Hearings - SDM]
  • August 11, 2020: [Add Disposition Text]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.