U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:20-bk-90195-
  • Case Name: JAMISON RICHARD BANNA and JENNIFER LYNN BANNA
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 01, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • December 14, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order Discharging Debtors in a Chapter 7 Case (Joint)]
  • December 12, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • December 10, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Extend Time]
  • December 09, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Assignmen/Transfer of Claim]
  • December 09, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • November 10, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Complaints Deadline]
  • November 10, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Extend Time]
  • November 10, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
  • November 07, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • November 05, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • November 05, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
October, 2020
  • October 25, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • October 23, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • October 23, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • October 23, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • October 21, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Generic Motion]
  • October 09, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • October 07, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
  • October 06, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Generic Motion - BK]
  • October 03, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • October 01, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • October 01, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • September 14, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Approving Stipulation]
August, 2020
  • August 29, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules]
  • August 27, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • August 27, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.